U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Ellis v. Petersen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 05, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • October 08, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • October 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 03, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • October 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Praecipe]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.