U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Fisher et al v. Mulligan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 01, 2020: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2020: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 17, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 14, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • August 14, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 13, 2020: [Statement]
  • August 11, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 11, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • August 11, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • July 30, 2020: [Supplement]
  • July 29, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • July 28, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • July 27, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 24, 2020: [Strike]
  • July 15, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • July 15, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 14, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 15, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • May 29, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 20, 2020: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 01, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Compel]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • December 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Joint Case Management Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 10, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • September 24, 2019: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 23, 2019: [Opposition]
  • September 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 10, 2019: [Stay Case]
  • September 10, 2019: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 05, 2019: [Payment Entry]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.