U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 09-21016
  • Case Name: Edward H. Hebbler and Amy Walters Hebbler
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 25, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Transmittal of Unclaimed Funds]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
November, 2020
  • November 21, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • November 07, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compromise]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compensation]
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Compromise]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Employ]
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • August 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Royal, Randy L. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.