U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00174
  • Case Name: Nautica Entertainment LLC v. Allied Debt Collection of Virginia LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • November 24, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 23, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 13, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
  • September 07, 2021: [Stay Case]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 27, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 27, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • December 01, 2020: [Sanctions]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • November 09, 2020: [Transcript - SEALED]
  • November 09, 2020: [Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2020: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • October 22, 2020: [Bench Trial]
  • October 22, 2020: [Bench Trial - Began]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Quash]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • October 05, 2020: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • October 04, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • September 29, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • September 28, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 23, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 18, 2020: [In Limine]
  • September 10, 2020: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 09, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 24, 2020: [Return of Subpoena]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 14, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 04, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 27, 2020: [Compel]
  • July 27, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 26, 2020: [Witness List]
  • June 01, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 20, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 18, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 15, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • May 15, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 17, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • April 17, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
  • February 25, 2020: [Notice of Status Conference]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 30, 2019: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 22, 2019: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • October 03, 2019: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • October 03, 2019: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 03, 2019: [Financial Entry]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 28, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2019: [Praecipe]
  • August 21, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.