U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Jorgensen et al v. Riggs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2021: [Dismiss]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 09, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • December 08, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 07, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 04, 2020: [Witness List]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 17, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 16, 2020: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • November 16, 2020: [Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Brief]
  • November 16, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 13, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • November 12, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 11, 2020: [Mediation/Settlement Conference]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 09, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Opposition]
  • November 02, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Witness List]
  • October 20, 2020: [Exhibit/Witness List]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 17, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 06, 2020: [Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 30, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • May 27, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • May 26, 2020: [Set Aside]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Mail Returned]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • January 27, 2020: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • January 23, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Application]
  • January 15, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • January 15, 2020: [Entry of Default]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 03, 2019: [Jury Demand]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2019
  • November 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.