U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Moser v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2022: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • December 23, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 22, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 22, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Appeal]
  • December 22, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • June 02, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 29, 2020: [Response]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • April 01, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Impending Dismissal]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.