U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Depina v. Seventh Judicial Circuit Court Judge
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Letter(s)]
  • November 18, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 15, 2019: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 04, 2019: [Dismissing Case]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.