U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Hartley et al v. Jenny Lake Lodge Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • August 11, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Supplement]
  • June 22, 2021: [Strike]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • May 28, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 26, 2021: [Reply]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 24, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 24, 2021: [In Limine]
  • May 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Designation]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Strike]
  • May 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 05, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 16, 2021: [Designation]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • April 08, 2021: [Withdraw Document]
  • April 08, 2021: [Strike]
  • April 07, 2021: [Reply]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 03, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
November, 2020
  • November 02, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 26, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • June 25, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 11, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 07, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 03, 2019: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 15, 2019: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 25, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.