U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Best of the West Productions LLC et al v. Cunningham
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Mediation]
May, 2021
  • May 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 26, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • October 26, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • September 14, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • August 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 27, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 01, 2020: [Designation]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 26, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 01, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • April 27, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • April 01, 2020: [Statement]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 13, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 09, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.