U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Chadwick v Biomet Orthopedics Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • September 28, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 11, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Status Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Status Conference]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 29, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 27, 2020: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • January 23, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.