U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Ferguson v. Underriner Motors Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Minute Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • May 04, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • April 05, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • February 16, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Setting Hearing]
  • September 08, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 11, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 11, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2020: [Praecipe]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • May 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.