U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Joy vs Young
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 22, 2021: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • June 09, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 07, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Proposed Verdict]
  • April 19, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 16, 2021: [Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law]
  • April 16, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • April 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • April 12, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Dispositive)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Statement]
  • March 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • March 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 12, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 12, 2020: [Substitute Attorney]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • June 29, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [Removal]
  • June 26, 2020: [Complaint]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.