U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Salway v. Norris
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
  • September 07, 2021: [Transcript Letter]
  • September 02, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Transcript Request (Transcripts Already on File) - Appeal]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 18, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • August 18, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 13, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 14, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Designation]
  • April 30, 2021: [Witness List]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • March 25, 2021: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 09, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • July 14, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.