U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Murray et al v. Royal Truck & Equipment Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Status Report]
  • September 04, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 15, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • July 13, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • July 10, 2020: [Praecipe]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • July 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.