U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Torres et al v. Norris et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Supplement]
  • August 05, 2021: [Reply to Response]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Opposition]
  • July 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • June 22, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 07, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 04, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [(TRMD)Order on Motion to Sever]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 19, 2020: [Reply to Response]
  • October 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 13, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Dismiss Party]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • September 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2020: [Reply Brief]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • September 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 21, 2020: [Recusal]
  • August 21, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 21, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 21, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 07, 2020: [Praecipe]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Praecipe]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.