U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Bowers et al v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Dismissing Case]
  • May 12, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • August 26, 2020: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Complexity]
  • August 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • August 04, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.