U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00185
  • Case Name: Hansen et al v. Grand Targhee Resort LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
  • July 03, 2022: [In Limine]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2022: [In Limine]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Witness List]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 07, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
  • December 01, 2021: [Designation of Experts]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 16, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Amended Initial Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • April 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2020: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 10, 2020: [Stipulation of Consent to Trial Before Magistrate Judge]
November, 2020
  • November 15, 2020: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • November 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • September 30, 2020: [Acceptance of Service]
  • September 29, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.