U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-00500
  • Case Name: Kors et al v. Klein et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 14, 2022: [Transcript - SEALED]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [JERS Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Designate Documents as HSD]
  • January 20, 2021: [Motion to Designate Document as HSD]
  • January 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to File HSD]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Filing of HSD]
  • January 20, 2021: [Motion to File - HSD]
  • January 20, 2021: [Transcript - Non Public]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.