U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Davis v. Wyoming Highway Patrol Trooper
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Reopening Case]
  • January 20, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 20, 2021: [Letter(s)]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismissing Case]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.