U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00198
  • Case Name: Cobra Trucking Incorporated v. Flanders Electric Motor Service Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2021
  • January 20, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 13, 2021: [Joint Case Management Plan]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of IPT Conference]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 01, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 01, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 04, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.