U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Carter v. Genesis Alkali LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Vacating Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Response]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 21, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 21, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Letter(s)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Mandamus]
  • October 20, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2022: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • September 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 19, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • August 29, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • August 29, 2022: [Disqualify]
  • August 22, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • August 08, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • July 22, 2022: [Vacate]
  • July 22, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 09, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 02, 2022: [Reply to Response]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Disqualify]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • December 08, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • October 07, 2021: [Disqualify]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 01, 2021: [Reconsideration]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 21, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • May 18, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • May 04, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 04, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2021: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • March 15, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 15, 2021: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 05, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 16, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 08, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
  • February 05, 2021: [Objection]
  • February 05, 2021: [Default Judgment]
  • February 02, 2021: [Notice of Joinder]
  • February 02, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 20, 2021: [Financial Entry]
  • January 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • November 25, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.