U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00200
  • Case Name: Williams v. Wyoming Department of Transportation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Verbal Notice of Settlement]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice of IPT Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 02, 2021: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2021: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • January 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • January 13, 2021: [Brief]
  • January 13, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 28, 2020: [Exhibits]
  • December 23, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 23, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • December 23, 2020: [Counterclaim]
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
  • December 16, 2020: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 07, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 07, 2020: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 01, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.