U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00234
  • Case Name: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT et al v. BERNHARDT et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • July 18, 2022: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • July 08, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • June 21, 2022: [Transcript Letter]
  • June 17, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
  • June 13, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 10, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • June 10, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • February 16, 2022: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Brief]
  • January 19, 2022: [Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 01, 2021: [Opposition]
  • December 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2021: [Brief]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages]
  • November 18, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Dispositive)]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • September 15, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 20, 2021: [Compel]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • August 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 13, 2021: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 16, 2021: [Opposition]
  • July 09, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • July 02, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 02, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • July 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 27, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Brief]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 25, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Reply Brief]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Supplement]
  • February 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • February 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 04, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order]
  • February 03, 2021: [File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive)]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 24, 2020: [Order]
  • December 23, 2020: [Financial Entry]
  • December 23, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • December 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.