U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:20-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Majors v. Wyoming Attorney General et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Response]
  • January 11, 2021: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • January 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Requiring Service and Response]
  • December 18, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.