U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Mock et al v. Fitzgerald et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal - (Attorney)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Witness List]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Reply to Response]
  • May 17, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2021: [Jury Demand]
  • April 28, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.