U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00044
  • Case Name: Regan v. Mountain States Water Service, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Sanctions]
  • January 20, 2023: [Trial Brief]
  • January 20, 2023: [Brief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 19, 2023: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • January 13, 2023: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Exhibit List]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 28, 2022: [Brief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Amended Minute Sheet]
  • December 22, 2022: [Response]
  • December 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 02, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 02, 2022: [In Limine]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Opposition]
  • November 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing - Non- Dispositive]
  • November 23, 2022: [Hearing - Non-Dispositive]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Request for Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 31, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 20, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 09, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Designation of Experts]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • January 13, 2022: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • December 29, 2021: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • December 29, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
  • December 13, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Magistrate Judge Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 11, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 10, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Praecipe]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • March 03, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.