U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Gibson v. Simon Contractors et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • November 07, 2022: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Consolidate Cases for Trial]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 14, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • September 12, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • September 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 22, 2022: [Praecipe]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • July 14, 2022: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.