U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00106
  • Case Name: Khan v. Pigeon Freight Services Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 18, 2025: [Designation of Experts]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Entry]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2024
  • October 30, 2024: [Set Aside]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.