U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Crane et al v. Bedrock Petroleum Consulting LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Jury Question]
  • May 01, 2025: [Jury Trial]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Jury Question]
  • April 30, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Jury Question]
  • April 29, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 28, 2025: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • April 28, 2025: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 24, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2025: [Return of Subpoena]
  • April 04, 2025: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Final Pretrial Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Regarding Appeal of Magistrate Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Objection]
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • March 20, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Response]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Strike]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Designation of Experts]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.