U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00009
  • Case Name: Capital Services Group LLC v. JC Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Request for Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Disclosure of Corporations]
  • March 18, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Third Party Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: [Set Aside]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.