U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-01284
  • Case Name: MARK MCCLESKEY et al v. CWG PLASTERING, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Clerks Entry for Release of Exhibits]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 08, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • February 08, 2021: [Parties Short Record]
  • February 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 03, 2020: [Entry]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • July 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 03, 2020: [Set Aside Judgment]
  • July 03, 2020: [New Trial(Trial De Novo)]
  • July 03, 2020: [Motion (Other)]
  • July 03, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • June 05, 2020: [Closed Judgment]
  • June 05, 2020: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order on Motion in Limine]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Strike]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Filing]
  • August 19, 2019: [Proposed Findings of Fact]
  • August 19, 2019: [Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law (proposed)]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Entry]
  • July 19, 2019: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 19, 2019: [Official Transcript]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • May 06, 2019: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 03, 2019: [Exhibit in Support]
  • May 03, 2019: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 02, 2019: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • May 01, 2019: [Appear pro hac vice]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 15, 2019: [Pretrial Conference - Final]
  • April 05, 2019: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Strike]
  • April 03, 2019: [Reply in Support of Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2019: [In Limine]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 28, 2019: [SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc)]
  • February 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 27, 2019: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 20, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 19, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 08, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 08, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 01, 2019: [Witness List]
  • February 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • January 29, 2019: [Strike]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Status Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [SCHEDULING Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 17, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 14, 2018: [SCHEDULING Order]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Reassignment Order - LJM]
  • August 22, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Appeal Remark]
  • October 20, 2017: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Submission]
  • May 22, 2017: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • May 09, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 09, 2017: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 09, 2017: [Parties Short Record]
  • May 08, 2017: [Docketing Statement]
  • May 08, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [Closed Judgment]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2017: [0 - Reassignment Order - DKL]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Reply in Support of Motion]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response (For Court Use Only)]
  • March 02, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2017: [Notice of Change of Attorney Information]
  • February 04, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 02, 2017: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • February 02, 2017: [Status Conference]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Exhibit in Support]
  • January 31, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 31, 2017: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • January 31, 2017: [Motion (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 20, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 08, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • October 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 20, 2016: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Compel]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2016: [Submission]
  • October 14, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reassignment Letter (Recusal/Related Case/Workload/Other)]
  • October 03, 2016: [Reassignment Order]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Motion (Other)]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order on Motion]
  • September 12, 2016: [Motion (Other)]
  • September 09, 2016: [SCHEDULING Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Order on Motion]
  • August 23, 2016: [Motion (Other)]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order - Case Management]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 23, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 23, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 18, 2016: [Case Management Plan Tendered by]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Compel]
  • June 20, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • June 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Case Management Plan Tendered by]
  • May 19, 2016: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice to File Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 16, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • May 16, 2016: [Motion (Other)]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 17, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Leave to File]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • November 27, 2015: [Motion (Other)]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 02, 2015: [Extension of Time (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Extension of Time (Other)]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
August, 2015
  • August 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 14, 2015: [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
  • August 13, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 13, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.