U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00163
  • Case Name: BEDIVERE INSURANCE COMPANY v. KENNEBUNK SEWER DISTRICT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.