U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00887
  • Case Name: Espinosa v. Wahab Zada et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2023: [Consolidate Cases]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 09, 2023: [Vacate]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 28, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • December 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 12, 2022: [Affidavit of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.