U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10550
  • Case Name: Malik Karim West
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Discharging Ch. 13 Trustee & Closing Case]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
December, 2024
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Receipt of Installment Payment]
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Order to Show Cause in Writing Terminated]
October, 2024
  • October 21, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • October 04, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Discharging Ch. 13 Trustee & Closing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.