U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Powder River Basin Resource Council et al v. U.S. Department of Interior Secretary et
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Status Report]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • January 27, 2016: [Stay Case]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [~Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • August 17, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2015
  • February 14, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.