U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:14-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Powder River Basin Resource Council et al v. U.S. Department of Interior Secretary et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Dismissing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Response]
  • July 07, 2017: [Response]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • September 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • September 23, 2016: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • September 22, 2016: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 14, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • September 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Response]
  • September 02, 2016: [Stay Case]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Suggestion of Bankruptcy]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Reply Brief]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Opposition]
  • June 02, 2016: [Response]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 27, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 28, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2016: [Brief]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive]
  • March 24, 2016: [Extension of Time (Dispositive)]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.