U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Knezovich v. Stihl Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • July 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • May 02, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Setting Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 28, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 05, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Initial Pretrial Conference]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 03, 2015: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Joint Case Management Plan]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Recusing Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.