U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cv-00085
  • Case Name: WildEarth Guardians et al v. United States Forest Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
  • September 17, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 03, 2019: [Setting Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Status Report]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Compliance with Court Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Status Report Order]
  • May 06, 2019: [Status Report]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Status Report]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 06, 2019: [Status Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Status Report]
  • February 04, 2019: [Status Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Status Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Status Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Status Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Status Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Status Report]
  • August 01, 2018: [Status Report]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Status Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Status Report]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order]
  • March 12, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Status Report]
  • January 25, 2018: [Reply to Response]
  • January 18, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 02, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 21, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 21, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Status Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • November 28, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Mandate]
  • November 09, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Transcript Letter]
October, 2015
  • October 09, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 09, 2015: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2015
  • August 17, 2015: [Order]
  • August 17, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.