U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cv-00031
  • Case Name: WildEarth Guardians v. United States Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 05, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Staying Case]
  • August 07, 2019: [Status Report]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 10, 2019: [Stay Case]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
  • March 11, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 13, 2019: [Financial Entry]
  • February 12, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • February 11, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.