U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Reimers v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 02, 2016: [Attorney Fees]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Reply to Response]
  • December 16, 2015: [Reply Brief]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Brief]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [~Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 02, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.