U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00205
  • Case Name: Smith v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • August 30, 2016: [Remand]
  • August 02, 2016: [Brief]
  • August 01, 2016: [Brief]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 20, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 18, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.