U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 20-20566
  • Case Name: Stephen K Simpson and Rebecca J Simpson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 31, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report and Account]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 08, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Filing Final Report]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Compensation]
  • January 06, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Final Report Before Distribution]
April, 2021
  • April 03, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 09, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
February, 2021
  • February 20, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Automatic Discharge of Debtor]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • February 16, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 23, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [341 Meeting Concluded]
  • December 19, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report]
  • December 18, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Directive]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Request for Special Notice]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Social Security Number]
  • November 02, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [Creditor Request for Notices]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, David L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.