U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00029
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Twelve Firearms and Assorted Ammunition
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Default Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Default Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 18, 2020: [Default Entry by Clerk]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Errata]
  • June 16, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • January 29, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 27, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • January 24, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • January 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.