U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00186
  • Case Name: Reimers v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Reply to Response]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Reply Brief]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Brief]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • June 05, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • May 07, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Brief]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 26, 2018: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Filing Admin Record]
  • February 09, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed-US Gov]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Financial Entry]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 06, 2017: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Complaint and Petition-Social Security]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.